US HB3692 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on October 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lake Tahoe Restoration Act of 2015 This bill revises and reauthorizes the Lake Tahoe Restoration Act for 10 fiscal years after the bill's enactment. The bill adds requirements for the management of the Lake Tahoe Basin Management Unit, including requiring the U.S. Forest Service to: coordinate with the Environmental Protection Agency and state and local entities in managing the Basin; conduct forest management activities in the Basin in a manner that attains multiple ecosystem benefits, unless such activities would excessively increase the cost of any project; and establish and monitor post-program ground condition criteria for ground disturbance caused by forest management activities. The Forest Service may enter into contracts and cooperative agreements with government and other public and private entities to provide for fuel reduction, erosion control, reforestation, restoration, and similar activities in the Basin. The bill mandates priority programs in the Basin, including programs for fire risk reduction and forest management, invasive species management, and stormwater management. The bill requires relevant federal and state agencies, including the Tahoe Regional Planning Agency, and the states of California and Nevada, to develop and update an integrated multiagency assessment and monitoring plan to measure the effectiveness of the Agency's Environmental Improvement Program. The bill amends the Santini-Burton Act to authorize: (1) a donation from California to the Forest Service of lands administered by its agencies, and (2) a transfer from the Forest Service to Nevada of certain lands in the Basin.
Title
Lake Tahoe Restoration Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On Passage of the Bill S. 2848 (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S. 2848 (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S. 2848 (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2015-10-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-10-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2015-10-06 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-10-06 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2015-10-06 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2015-10-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-10-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1724 (Same As) 2016-05-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 470.
SB2848 (Related) 2016-09-19 - Held at the desk.
SB2848 (Related) 2016-09-19 - Held at the desk.