US HB3695 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-1)
Status: Introduced on September 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protect DREAMer Confidentiality Act of 2017 This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to protect individual application information submitted to DHS after June 15, 2012, as part of a request for consideration or reconsideration for the Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals (DACA) program from disclosure to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE) or U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) for any purpose other than implementing such program. Such information may be shared with national security and law enforcement agencies: (1) to identify or prevent fraudulent claims, (2) for national security purposes relating to an individual application, or (3) for the investigation or prosecution of a felony not related to immigration status. DHS may not refer an individual whose case has been deferred pursuant to the DACA program to ICE, CBP, the Department of Justice, or any other law enforcement agency.
Title
Protect DREAMer Confidentiality Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2017-09-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-09-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB229 (Same As) 2017-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Government information and archives
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Law enforcement administration and funding
Right of privacy
Criminal justice information and records
Government information and archives
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Law enforcement administration and funding
Right of privacy
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3695/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3695/BILLS-115hr3695ih.pdf |