US HB3713 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-16 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-16 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds Mount Vernon to the list of locations where court must be held in the Western District of Washington.
Title
To amend title 28, United States Code, provide an additional place for holding court for the Western District of Washington, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-15 | House | Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet Discharged. |
2019-08-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet. |
2019-07-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-07-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3713/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3713/BILLS-116hr3713ih.pdf |