US HB3722 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to establish a joint task force to enhance border security operations to detect, interdict, disrupt, and prevent narcotics such as fentanyl and other synthetic opioids from entering the United States. DHS shall report to Congress as to whether it will establish such a task force. If such a task force is established, DHS shall periodically report to Congress on issues such as what additional resources are needed to detect and prevent narcotics from entering the United States. The bill also authorizes DHS joint task forces to engage with and receive assistance from outside DHS, including private sector organizations and federal, state, local, tribal, territorial, or international entities.
Title
Joint Task Force to Combat Opioid Trafficking Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-27 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 554 (Y: 403 N: 1 NV: 29 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-09-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 1 (Roll no. 554). (text: 09/26/2019 CR H8022-8023) |
2019-09-27 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8071-8072) |
2019-09-26 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-09-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3722. |
2019-09-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8022-8024) |
2019-09-26 | House | Mr. Correa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-08-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 152. |
2019-08-30 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-194. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2019-07-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Executive agency funding and structure
Immigration
Intergovernmental relations
Public-private cooperation
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Executive agency funding and structure
Immigration
Intergovernmental relations
Public-private cooperation