US HB3723 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 552.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 552.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2025 a grant program for constructing desalination projects. The bill also revises the program, including by requiring the prioritization of projects that maximize energy efficiency and the use of renewable energy.
Title
Desalination Development Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 552. |
2020-12-18 | House | Committee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged. |
2020-12-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-668, Part I. |
2020-03-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 10. |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-11 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2019-07-25 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-07-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-07-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Animal and plant health
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Aquatic ecology
Building construction
Congressional oversight
Endangered and threatened species
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Noise pollution
Pollution liability
Research administration and funding
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Water quality
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water storage
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Animal and plant health
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Aquatic ecology
Building construction
Congressional oversight
Endangered and threatened species
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Noise pollution
Pollution liability
Research administration and funding
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Water quality
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water storage
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection