US HB3729 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for enhanced protections for vulnerable unaccompanied alien children, and for other purposes.
Title
Child Trafficking Victims Protection and Welfare Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-08-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2019-07-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Appropriations, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Appropriations, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Appropriations, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Appropriations, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB661 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Appropriations
Border security and unlawful immigration
Child care and development
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Domestic violence and child abuse
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Family relationships
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Human trafficking
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement officers
Lawyers and legal services
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Right of privacy
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Border security and unlawful immigration
Child care and development
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Domestic violence and child abuse
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Family relationships
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Human trafficking
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement officers
Lawyers and legal services
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Right of privacy
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3729/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3729/BILLS-116hr3729ih.pdf |