US HB3734 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Introduced on October 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 509.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 509.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mining Schools Enhancement Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Surface Mining Control and Reclamation Act of 1977 to require the Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement (OSMRE) of the Department of the Interior to ensure that at least 70% of specified research funds are expended to enhance and support programs at mining and mineral engineering schools in the United States. In addition, OSMRE shall ensure that research activities relate to conventional fuel resource development and production.
Title
Mining Schools Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Cresent Hardy [R-NV] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] |
Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] |
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Ryan Zinke [R-MT] |
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 509. |
2016-07-05 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-658. |
2016-06-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-06-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-06-14 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2015-12-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearing Held (Idaho Springs, Colorado). |
2015-10-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2015-10-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-10-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Education programs funding
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Higher education
Mining
Public lands and natural resources
Science and engineering education
Education programs funding
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Higher education
Mining
Public lands and natural resources
Science and engineering education