US HB3739 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Presidential Allowance Modernization Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Former Presidents Act of 1958 to to revise provisions governing the compensation provided to a former President. Each former President shall receive from the United States an annuity of $200,000 per year. The General Services Administration (GSA) is authorized to provide each former President a monetary allowance of $500,000 per year for five years beginning six months after the expiration of his or her term, $350,000 per year for the next five years, and $250,000 per year thereafter. Such annuity and allowance shall be increased each year by the same percentage as Social Security benefits. Such allowance shall be reduced by the amount the former President's earned income exceeds $400,000. The bill: (1) limits the office staff provided for each former President to not more than 13 individuals, and (2) requires that suitable office space for a former President be provided on a reimbursable basis. The increases from $20,000 per year to $100,000 per year, and provides for cost-of-living adjustments to, the monetary allowance amount for surviving spouses of former Presidents.
Title
Presidential Allowance Modernization Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-11-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9145-9146) |
2017-11-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3739. |
2017-11-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9145-9148) |
2017-11-13 | House | Mr. Hice, Jody B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-11-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 301. |
2017-11-13 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-407. |
2017-09-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-09-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-09-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-09-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1791 (Same As) 2018-02-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 337.
Subjects
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Inflation and prices
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Government operations and politics
Inflation and prices
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents