US HB3754 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates regulatory controls and administrative, civil, and criminal penalties under the Controlled Substances Act for certain marijuana-related activities that comply with state or tribal law.
Title
To amend the Controlled Substances Act to provide for a new rule regarding the application of the Act to marihuana, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Amash [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-07-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-07-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2093 (Related) 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1028 (Related) 2019-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1028 (Related) 2019-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Alternative treatments
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Transportation safety and security
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3754/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3754/BILLS-116hr3754ih.pdf |