US HB3755 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redesignates the Sullys Hill National Game Preserve in North Dakota as the "White Horse Hill National Game Preserve."
Title
White Horse Hill National Game Preserve Designation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-07-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-07-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2099 (Same As) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
North Dakota
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3755/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3755/BILLS-116hr3755ih.pdf |