US HB3756 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on October 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-10-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-10-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment Compensation Extension Act of 2009 - Amends the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 with respect to the state-established individual emergency unemployment compensation account (EUCA). Requires a further additional Tier-3 period for deposits to an individual's EUCA, using the current formula, if, at the time the amount added to such individual's account under the Act is exhausted or at any time thereafter, the individual's state is in an extended benefit period. Prescribes a formula for determining if a state is in an extended benefit period. Allows the Tier-3 period augmentation to be applied to the individual's EUCA only once. Authorizes a state to pay extended compensation to an otherwise eligible individual before any further additional emergency unemployment compensation (EUC), if such individual claimed extended compensation for at least one week of unemployment after the exhaustion of additional EUC.
Title
Unemployment Compensation Extension Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Leonard Boswell [D-IA] | Rep. Bruce Braley [D-IA] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
Rep. Paul Hodes [D-NH] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Thomas Perriello [D-VA] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] |
Rep. Harry Teague [D-NM] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-07 | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3404 (Related) 2009-07-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB3548 (Related) 2009-11-06 - Became Public Law No: 111-92.
HB4183 (Related) 2009-12-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Income Security and Family Support.
HB4691 (Related) 2010-03-02 - Became Public Law No: 111-144.
HB4707 (Related) 2010-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Income Security and Family Support.
HB4851 (Related) 2010-04-15 - Became Public Law No: 111-157.
SB1647 (Related) 2009-08-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S9082-9083)
SB1699 (Related) 2009-09-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S9745)
SB2831 (Related) 2009-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S12325-12327)
SB3153 (Related) 2010-03-25 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure tabled in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 59 - 40. Record Vote Number: 106. (consideration: CR S2094)
SB3173 (Related) 2010-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3420 (Related) 2010-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4221-4222)
HB5453 (Related) 2010-05-28 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB5618 (Related) 2010-07-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 459.
HB5647 (Related) 2010-10-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3551 (Related) 2010-06-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4213 (Related) 2010-07-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-205.
SB3706 (Related) 2010-08-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6419 (Related) 2010-11-18 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 258 - 154 (Roll no. 579).
SB3981 (Related) 2010-12-01 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S8343)
HB6556 (Related) 2010-12-17 - Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
SB3990 (Related) 2010-11-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3548 (Related) 2009-11-06 - Became Public Law No: 111-92.
HB4183 (Related) 2009-12-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Income Security and Family Support.
HB4691 (Related) 2010-03-02 - Became Public Law No: 111-144.
HB4707 (Related) 2010-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Income Security and Family Support.
HB4851 (Related) 2010-04-15 - Became Public Law No: 111-157.
SB1647 (Related) 2009-08-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S9082-9083)
SB1699 (Related) 2009-09-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S9745)
SB2831 (Related) 2009-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S12325-12327)
SB3153 (Related) 2010-03-25 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure tabled in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 59 - 40. Record Vote Number: 106. (consideration: CR S2094)
SB3173 (Related) 2010-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3420 (Related) 2010-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4221-4222)
HB5453 (Related) 2010-05-28 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB5618 (Related) 2010-07-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 459.
HB5647 (Related) 2010-10-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3551 (Related) 2010-06-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4213 (Related) 2010-07-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-205.
SB3706 (Related) 2010-08-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6419 (Related) 2010-11-18 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 258 - 154 (Roll no. 579).
SB3981 (Related) 2010-12-01 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S8343)
HB6556 (Related) 2010-12-17 - Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
SB3990 (Related) 2010-11-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/3756/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr3756/BILLS-111hr3756ih.pdf |