US HB3763 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the President to establish an interagency working group to provide assistance and technical expertise to enhance U.S. leadership in international bodies that set standards for 5th and future generations of mobile telecommunications (5G) technology, such as the International Telecommunication Union. The President shall also work to increase the participation of allies, partners, and the private sector. (International bodies develop standards for certain technologies, such as those used in wireless data transmission, to ensure interoperability between different companies' products. Stakeholders, such as companies that manufacture equipment that uses such technologies or companies that hold relevant patents, typically participate in the standards-setting process.) The interagency group shall report to and, on request, brief Congress on (1) its strategy to promote U.S. leadership in the standards-setting bodies relevant to 5G technology; (2) its strategy for diplomatic engagement with allies and partners to share security-risk information related to 5G; (3) China's activities in standards-setting bodies for 5G technology, including the scope and scale of such activities; and (4) a strategy for engaging with private-sector stakeholders, academia, and federally funded research and development centers to propose and develop secure standards for 5G technology.
Title
Promoting United States International Leadership in 5G Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] |
Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-01-08 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2020-01-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-01-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H30) |
2020-01-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3763. |
2020-01-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H30-33) |
2020-01-08 | House | Ms. Titus moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-10-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-07-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4272 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Alliances
Asia
China
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Public-private cooperation
Telephone and wireless communication
Asia
China
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Public-private cooperation
Telephone and wireless communication