US HB38 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 200-4)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 18, United States Code, to provide a means by which nonresidents of a State whose residents may carry concealed firearms may also do so in the State.
Title
Concealed Carry Reciprocity Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1691 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB4501 (Same As) 2022-07-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4501 (Same As) 2022-07-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/38/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr38/BILLS-117hr38ih.pdf |