US HB381 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

21st Century Respect Act This bill requires the Department of Agriculture (USDA) and the General Services Administration to change the terminology used to describe the racial background or place of origin of people in regulations concerning (1) USDA programs for financing and insuring loans for properties in rural areas, and (2) the 1974 development plan for Pennsylvania Avenue in Washington, DC.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

21st Century Respect Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
2019-01-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback