US HB3834 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-6)
Status: Passed on November 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-276. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-6)
Status: Passed on November 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-276. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
9/11 Heroes Medal of Valor Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill makes eligible for the 9/11 Heroes Medal of Valor a public safety officer who: (1) participated in the response to the terrorist attacks of September 11, 2001; and (2) died because of such participation as a result of a WTC-related health condition (i.e., a World Trade Center-related health condition).
Title
9/11 Heroes Medal of Valor Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] |
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] |
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] |
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. John Faso [R-NY] |
Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-03 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-276. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-11-03 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-10-24 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-10-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6882) |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2018-09-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9067) |
2018-09-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3834. |
2018-09-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9067-9068) |
2018-09-26 | House | Mr. Tipton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-09-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-09-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional tributes
Department of Defense
First responders and emergency personnel
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
New York City
Pennsylvania
Terrorism
Virginia
Worker safety and health
Congressional tributes
Department of Defense
First responders and emergency personnel
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
New York City
Pennsylvania
Terrorism
Virginia
Worker safety and health