US HB3844 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Bureau of Land Management Foundation Act (Sec. 3) This bill establishes the Bureau of Land Management Foundation as a charitable, nonprofit organization to encourage, accept, obtain, administer, and use private gifts of money, devises, and bequests of real and personal property for the benefit of, or in connection with, the activities and services of the Bureau of Land Management (BLM). The foundation shall conduct and encourage programs and activities that support: educational, technical, scientific, and other assistance or activities to support the management of BLM lands with regard to wild free-roaming horses and burros, fish and wildlife and their habitats, National Conservation Lands, and recreation, cultural, and historic resources; and activities that support the reclamation and remediation of specified abandoned mine lands, specified orphaned oil and gas well sites, or public lands impacted by development connected to mineral exploration and development activities. Reclamation activities are to include the remediation of soil and water contamination; the restoration of wildlife habitat in order to restore the natural, scenic, historic, cultural, and ecological values of those areas; or promotion of the areas' economic potential.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bureau of Land Management Foundation Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-06SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2016-07-05HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2016-07-05HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2016-07-05HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4246-4248)
2016-07-05HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3844.
2016-07-05HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4246-4248)
2016-07-05HouseMr. Hice, Jody B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2016-07-01HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 503.
2016-07-01HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-651.
2016-06-15HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2016-06-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2016-06-14HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2016-06-14HouseSubcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
2015-11-04HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2015-10-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2015-10-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2015-10-28HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback