US HB3851 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 88-55)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 299.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 299.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(1) extends funding for Brand USA, the Corporation for Travel Promotion, through FY2027; (2) raises the fee for using the electronic system for travel authorization; and (3) otherwise modifies the duties and powers of Brand USA.
Title
Brand USA Extension Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 299. |
2020-01-13 | House | Committee on Homeland Security discharged. |
2020-01-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-376, Part I. |
2019-11-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-11-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-14 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2019-10-24 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-08-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2019-07-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2019-07-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2203 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 568.
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Commerce
Computers and information technology
Government information and archives
Immigration status and procedures
Performance measurement
Public-private cooperation
Travel and tourism
User charges and fees
Computers and information technology
Government information and archives
Immigration status and procedures
Performance measurement
Public-private cooperation
Travel and tourism
User charges and fees