US HB3867 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to take actions to improve assistance to veterans who experience domestic violence or sexual assault. Specifically, the bill requires the VA to implement a program to assist veterans who have experienced or are experiencing domestic violence or sexual assault in accessing VA benefits. The VA shall carry out the program in partnership with domestic violence shelters and programs, rape crisis centers, state domestic violence and sexual assault coalitions, and other appropriate service providers. The bill authorizes the VA to establish local coordinators to provide outreach under the program to effectively assist veterans who have experienced domestic violence or sexual assault. The VA must consult with the Department of Justice (DOJ) and the Department of Health and Human Services to establish a national task force to develop a comprehensive national program to address domestic violence and sexual assault among veterans by integrating VA facilities, services, and benefits into existing networks of community-based domestic violence and sexual assault services. The VA must consult with DOJ to conduct a national baseline study to examine the scope of the problem of domestic violence and sexual assault among veterans and spouses of veterans. Finally, the bill requires the Advisory Committee on Women Veterans to include in its biennial report an assessment of the effects of intimate partner violence on women veterans.
Title
Violence Against Women Veterans Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-11 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-08-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-07-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-07-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2915 (Related) 2019-11-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB3224 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB3224 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Assault and harassment offenses
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Domestic violence and child abuse
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government studies and investigations
Health care coverage and access
Sex offenses
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Assault and harassment offenses
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Domestic violence and child abuse
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government studies and investigations
Health care coverage and access
Sex offenses
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3867/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3867/BILLS-116hr3867ih.pdf |