US HB3870 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-28 - Became Public Law No: 112-221.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-28 - Became Public Law No: 112-221.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 6083 Highway 36 West in Rose Bud, Arkansas, as the "Nicky 'Nick' Daniel Bacon Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 6083 Highway 36 West in Rose Bud, Arkansas, as the "Nicky 'Nick' Daniel Bacon Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Mike Ross [D-AR] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-28 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-221. |
2012-12-28 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2012-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-12-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8230) |
2012-08-29 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security. |
2012-07-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2012-07-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-07-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5110) |
2012-07-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3870. |
2012-07-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5110-5111) |
2012-07-23 | House | Ms. Buerkle moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2012-02-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2012-02-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2012-02-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Subjects
Arkansas
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Postal service
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Postal service