US HB3884 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 68-1)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

MORE Act of 2019 Marijuana Opportunity Reinvestment and Expungement Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MORE Act of 2019 Marijuana Opportunity Reinvestment and Expungement Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]
Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-21HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
2019-11-21HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-11-19HouseSubcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
2019-08-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-08-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-07-23HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Small Business, Natural Resources, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-23HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Small Business, Natural Resources, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-23HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Small Business, Natural Resources, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-23HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Small Business, Natural Resources, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-23HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Small Business, Natural Resources, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-23HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Small Business, Natural Resources, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-23HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Small Business, Natural Resources, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-23HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Small Business, Natural Resources, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-23HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2227 (Same As) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3540 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3543 (Related) 2019-06-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB3544 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback