US HB390 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Adams Memorial Commission to replace the Adams Memorial Foundation in planning a permanent memorial in the District of Columbia to honor John Adams and his legacy. The commission terminates after seven years.
Title
To establish the Adams Memorial Commission to carry out the provisions of Public Law 107-62, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
District of Columbia
Government operations and politics
Monuments and memorials
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
U.S. history
Government operations and politics
Monuments and memorials
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
U.S. history
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/390/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr390/BILLS-116hr390ih.pdf |