US HB3916 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Government Accountability Office (GAO) to conduct a study on the protection of Native American seeds and traditional foods. Under the bill, sensitive tribal information gathered by the study shall be exempt from public disclosure requirements and shall be kept confidential by the GAO.
Title
Native American Seeds Protection Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research. |
2019-08-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2019-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2241 (Same As) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Subjects
Agricultural marketing and promotion
Agricultural practices and innovations
Agricultural research
Federal-Indian relations
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Horticulture and plants
Indian lands and resources rights
Marketing and advertising
Native Americans
Right of privacy
Agricultural practices and innovations
Agricultural research
Federal-Indian relations
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Horticulture and plants
Indian lands and resources rights
Marketing and advertising
Native Americans
Right of privacy
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3916/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3916/BILLS-116hr3916ih.pdf |