US HB3932 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-5)
Status: Introduced on July 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates veterans' copayments for medication, hospital care, and medical services related to preventive health services provided by the Department of Veterans Affairs. The bill expands the definition of preventive health services to include (1) evidence-based items or services that have an A or B rating in the recommendations of the United States Preventive Services Task Force; (2) immunizations that have a recommendation from the Advisory Committee on Immunization Practices of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention with respect to the individual involved; and (3) with respect to women, the preventive care and screenings provided for in the Health Resources and Services Administration Preventive Services Guidelines in effect as of January 1, 2017.
Title
Veterans Preventive Health Coverage Fairness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] |
Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] |
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] |
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-07-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-07-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1573 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Drug therapy
Health promotion and preventive care
Hospital care
Immunology and vaccination
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Veterans' medical care
Women's health
Drug therapy
Health promotion and preventive care
Hospital care
Immunology and vaccination
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Veterans' medical care
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3932/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3932/BILLS-116hr3932ih.pdf |