US HB3935 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides statutory authority for the requirement that state Medicaid programs cover nonemergency transportation to medically necessary services. The bill also requires states, as a condition of federal payment for such transportation services, to comply with certain utilization management requirements. States must also establish mechanisms that ensure transportation providers and drivers meet specified quality and safety standards. The Government Accountability Office must report on the extent of, and identify measures that prevent, Medicaid fraud and abuse in relation to such services. Additionally, the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services must, among other things, establish a stakeholder working group to address certain challenges regarding Medicaid program integrity and coverage of such services.
Title
Protecting Patients Transportation to Care Act
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] |
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] |
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4626-4627) |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3935. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4626-4627) |
2020-09-21 | House | Mrs. Dingell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 411. |
2020-09-17 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-511. |
2020-07-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2020-03-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-01-08 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-07-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-07-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-07-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Medicaid
State and local government operations
Transportation costs
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Medicaid
State and local government operations
Transportation costs
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security