US HB3941 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides statutory authority for the Federal Risk and Authorization Management Program (FedRAMP) within the General Services Administration (GSA). The GSA must establish a government-wide program that provides the authoritative standardized approach to security assessment and authorization for cloud computing products and services that process unclassified information used by agencies. Agencies must ensure that their cloud computing services meet GSA requirements. The bill establishes the Joint Authorization Board to conduct security assessments of cloud computing services and issue provisional authorizations to operate to cloud service providers that meet FedRAMP security guidelines. The GSA shall (1) determine the requirements for certification of independent assessment organizations, and (2) establish the Federal Secure Cloud Advisory Committee.
Title
FedRAMP Authorization Act Federal Risk and Authorization Management Program Authorization Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-02-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H815-817) |
2020-02-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3941. |
2020-02-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H815-819) |
2020-02-05 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 315. |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Reform. H. Rept. 116-391. |
2019-12-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-07-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
General Services Administration
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Public participation and lobbying
Advisory bodies
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
General Services Administration
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Public participation and lobbying