US HB3942 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Preventing Online Sales of E-Cigarettes to Children Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preventing Online Sales of E-Cigarettes to Children Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-29SenateReceived in the Senate.
2019-10-28HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-10-28HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8491)
2019-10-28HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3942.
2019-10-28HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8491-8493)
2019-10-28HouseMs. Bass moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-10-28HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 208.
2019-10-28HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-260.
2019-10-16HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-10-16HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-10-15HouseSubcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
2019-08-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-07-24HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-07-24HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1253 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2522)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback