US HB3957 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-09 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-09 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to increase diversity of ownership in the broadcasting industry. Specifically, the bill allows companies engaged in the qualifying sale of a broadcast station to receive favorable tax treatment by electing nonrecognition of the gain or loss resulting from the sale. To qualify for this treatment, the sale must result in or preserve ownership of a broadcast station by socially disadvantaged individuals. The bill also requires the FCC to foster investment in broadcast stations owned by socially disadvantaged individuals.
Title
Expanding Broadcast Ownership Opportunities Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] |
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] |
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-10 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2020-03-10 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-07-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2433 (Related) 2019-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Business investment and capital
Capital gains tax
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government studies and investigations
Income tax deductions
Income tax deferral
Licensing and registrations
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Science, technology, communications
Women in business
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Business investment and capital
Capital gains tax
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government studies and investigations
Income tax deductions
Income tax deferral
Licensing and registrations
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Science, technology, communications
Women in business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3957/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3957/BILLS-116hr3957ih.pdf |