US HB3962 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Energy Savings and Industrial Competitiveness Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy Savings and Industrial Competitiveness Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
2019-07-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, Financial Services, the Budget, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, Financial Services, the Budget, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, Financial Services, the Budget, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, Financial Services, the Budget, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, Financial Services, the Budget, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, Financial Services, the Budget, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2137 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 263.
HB1420 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 265.
HB2664 (Related) 2019-05-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
SB253 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 207.
SB1245 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 220.
SB1857 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 222.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Architecture
Building construction
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Energy
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy prices
Environmental technology
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Housing finance and home ownership
Industrial facilities
Industrial policy and productivity
Lighting, heating, cooling
Manufacturing
Oil and gas
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Public utilities and utility rates
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Small business
Solid waste and recycling
Telephone and wireless communication
Water quality
Water use and supply

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback