US HB3964 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide a civil remedy for individuals harmed by sanctuary jurisdiction policies, and for other purposes.
Title
Justice for Victims of Sanctuary Cities Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] |
Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] |
Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Rep. James Baird [R-IN] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] |
Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] |
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] |
Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-07-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-07-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2059 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Citizenship and naturalization
Civil actions and liability
Crime victims
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Economic development
Federal preemption
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Housing and community development funding
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Lawyers and legal services
Research administration and funding
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Violent crime
Citizenship and naturalization
Civil actions and liability
Crime victims
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Economic development
Federal preemption
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Housing and community development funding
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Lawyers and legal services
Research administration and funding
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3964/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3964/BILLS-116hr3964ih.pdf |