US HB3969 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SOS 2.0 Act Save Our Seas 2.0 Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SOS 2.0 Act Save Our Seas 2.0 Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
2019-08-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-07-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
2019-07-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Ways and Means, Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Ways and Means, Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Ways and Means, Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Ways and Means, Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Ways and Means, Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Ways and Means, Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Ways and Means, Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1982 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2364 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2372 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 239.

Subjects

Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Aquatic ecology
Atmospheric science and weather
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Energy research
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Foreign aid and international relief
Forests, forestry, trees
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Intergovernmental relations
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Manufacturing
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Materials
Multilateral development programs
Performance measurement
Product development and innovation
Public-private cooperation
Roads and highways
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Solid waste and recycling
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Water quality
Water use and supply

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback