US HB4022 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 68-0)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To abolish the death penalty under Federal law.
Title
Federal Death Penalty Abolition Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-07-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-07-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4052 (Related) 2019-08-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB2390 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5253)
SB2390 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5253)
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Espionage and treason
Firearms and explosives
Military law
Violent crime
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Espionage and treason
Firearms and explosives
Military law
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4022/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4022/BILLS-116hr4022ih.pdf |