US HB4052 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-1)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the imposition of a death penalty sentence for a violation of federal law. A person sentenced to death before enactment of this bill must be resentenced.
Title
To prohibit the imposition of the death penalty for any violation of Federal law, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-07-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-07-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4022 (Related) 2019-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB2390 (Same As) 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5253)
SB2390 (Same As) 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5253)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4052/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4052/BILLS-116hr4052ih.pdf |