US HB4055 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-25 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-25 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal Election Campaign Act to clarify the treatment of coordinated expenditures as contributions made to candidates under such Act, and for other purposes.
Title
Stop Super PAC–Candidate Coordination Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Price [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2019-07-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Congressional elections
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government operations and politics
Political advertising
Tax-exempt organizations
Congressional elections
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government operations and politics
Political advertising
Tax-exempt organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4055/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4055/BILLS-116hr4055ih.pdf |