US HB4091 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-8)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ARPA-E Reauthorization Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ARPA-E Reauthorization Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-10-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-11HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
2019-09-11HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2019-07-30HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
2019-07-30HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1015-1016)
2019-07-30HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3915 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
SB2714 (Related) 2019-11-06 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback