US HB4100 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires additional payment under Medicare's inpatient prospective payment system for services that involve certain antimicrobial drugs, in accordance with specified limitations. Additionally, the Government Accountability Office must report on the barriers to developing such antimicrobial drugs and must recommend ways to address such barriers.
Title
DISARM Act of 2019 Developing an Innovative Strategy for Antimicrobial Resistant Microorganisms Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] |
Rep. George Holding [R-NC] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] |
Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-07-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-07-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1712 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3548 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB3548 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medicare
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medicare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4100/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4100/BILLS-116hr4100ih.pdf |