US HB4131 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bring the Ancient One Home Act of 2015 This bill directs the Chief of the Army Corps of Engineers to transfer the human remains known as Kennewick Man or the Ancient One that are part of archaeological collection number 45BN495 to the Washington State Department of Archaeology and Historic Preservation on the condition that such Department disposes of and repatriates the remains to the Indian tribes and band referred to in the letter from Secretary of the Interior Bruce Babbitt to Secretary of the Army Louis Caldera relating to the human remains, dated September 21, 2000. The Corps of Engineers shall be responsible for any costs associated with the transfer.
Title
Bring the Ancient One Home Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On Passage of the Bill S. 2848 (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 4979 to S. 2848 (Water Resources Development Act of 2016) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 4979 to S. 2848 (Water Resources Development Act of 2016) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2015-12-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2015-11-30 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2015-11-30 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-11-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-11-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1979 (Same As) 2015-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB2848 (Related) 2016-09-19 - Held at the desk.
SB2848 (Related) 2016-09-19 - Held at the desk.