US HB4150 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-6)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Broadens the prohibition on importation or transportation of obscene materials. Specifically, the bill makes it a crime to import, or knowingly use a common carrier or interactive computer service to transport, a child sex doll.
Title
JUSTICE Act of 2019 Jurists United to Stop Trafficking Imitation Child Exploitation Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-08-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-08-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2401 (Same As) 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB8236 (Related) 2020-09-14 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB8236 (Related) 2020-09-14 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4150/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4150/BILLS-116hr4150ih.pdf |