US HB4151 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To improve agricultural job opportunities, benefits, and security for aliens in the United States and for other purposes.
Title
Undocumented Taxpayers Opportunity Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-08-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security. |
2019-08-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-08-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-08-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB641 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB175 (Related) 2019-01-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S294)
SB175 (Related) 2019-01-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S294)
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Foreign labor
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Migrant, seasonal, agricultural labor
Social security and elderly assistance
Travel and tourism
Congressional oversight
Foreign labor
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Migrant, seasonal, agricultural labor
Social security and elderly assistance
Travel and tourism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4151/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4151/BILLS-116hr4151ih.pdf |