US HB420 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 197-34)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Veterans' Heritage Firearms Act of 2011 - Provides a 90-day amnesty period during which veterans and their family members can register in the National Firearms Registration and Transfer Record any firearm acquired before October 31, 1968, by a veteran while a member of the Armed Forces stationed outside the continental United States. Grants such an individual limited immunity under the federal criminal code and the Internal Revenue Code with respect to the acquisition, possession, transportation, or alteration of such firearm before or concurrent with such registration. Extends such immunity to a veteran who attempts to register a qualifying firearm outside of the amnesty period if the veteran surrenders the firearm within 30 days after being notified of potential criminal liability for continued possession. Requires the Attorney General to: (1) transfer each firearm qualifying as a curio or relic which has been forfeited to the United States to the first qualified museum that requests it, and (2) publish information identifying each such firearm which is available to be transferred to a museum. Prohibits the Attorney General from destroying any such firearm which has been forfeited until five years after the forfeiture. Requires that any firearm transferred to a qualified museum be registered to the transferee. Makes a prohibition against transfer or possession of a machine-gun inapplicable to a transfer to or by, or possession by, a museum which is open to the public and incorporated as a not-for-profit corporation under applicable state law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans' Heritage Firearms Act of 2011

Sponsors

Rep. Denny Rehberg [R-MT]Rep. Sandy Adams [R-FL]Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL]Rep. Todd Akin [R-MO]
Rep. Rodney Alexander [R-LA]Rep. Jason Altmire [D-PA]Rep. Steve Austria [R-OH]Rep. Joe Baca [D-CA]
Rep. Michele Bachmann [R-MN]Rep. Spencer Bachus [R-AL]Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA]Rep. John Barrow [D-GA]
Rep. Roscoe Bartlett [R-MD]Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX]Rep. Charles Bass [R-NH]Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI]
Rep. Rick Berg [R-ND]Rep. Brian Bilbray [R-CA]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT]
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Diane Black [R-TN]Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN]Rep. Jo Bonner [R-AL]
Rep. Dan Boren [D-OK]Rep. Leonard Boswell [D-IA]Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA]Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX]
Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA]Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL]Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA]Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]
Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN]Rep. Ann Buerkle [R-NY]Rep. Dan Burton [R-IN]Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA]
Rep. Dave Camp [R-MI]Rep. Francisco Canseco [R-TX]Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV]Rep. Dennis Cardoza [D-CA]
Rep. John Carter [R-TX]Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT]
Rep. Ben Chandler [D-KY]Rep. Howard Coble [R-NC]Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]
Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX]Rep. Jerry Costello [D-IL]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR]
Rep. Ander Crenshaw [R-FL]Rep. Mark Critz [D-PA]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]Rep. John Culberson [R-TX]
Rep. Geoff Davis [R-KY]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA]Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN]
Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL]Rep. John Dingell [D-MI]Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN]Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI]
Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC]Rep. John Duncan [R-TN]Rep. Renee Ellmers [R-NC]Rep. Jo Emerson [R-MO]
Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX]Rep. Stephen Fincher [R-TN]Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ]
Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX]Rep. Randy Forbes [R-VA]Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC]Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ]Rep. Scott Garrett [R-NJ]Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH]
Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY]Rep. Phil Gingrey [R-GA]Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ]Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX]
Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO]Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA]Rep. Gene Green [D-TX]Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR]
Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA]Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY]Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY]Rep. Ralph Hall [R-TX]
Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY]Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS]Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]
Rep. Nan Hayworth [R-NY]Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM]Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV]Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX]
Rep. Wally Herger [R-CA]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Tim Holden [D-PA]
Rep. Tim Huelskamp [R-KS]Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI]Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL]Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA]
Rep. Robert Hurt [R-VA]Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA]Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]
Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX]Rep. Timothy Johnson [R-IL]Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC]Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH]
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Steve King [R-IA]Rep. Jack Kingston [R-GA]
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]Rep. Larry Kissell [D-NC]Rep. John Kline [R-MN]Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID]
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO]Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ]Rep. Jeffrey Landry [R-LA]Sen. James Lankford [R-OK]
Rep. Tom Latham [R-IA]Rep. Steven LaTourette [R-OH]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]Rep. Jerry Lewis [R-CA]
Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ]Rep. Billy Long [R-MO]Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK]Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO]
Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY]Rep. Daniel Lungren [R-CA]Rep. Connie Mack [R-FL]
Rep. Donald Manzullo [R-IL]Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX]Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY]Rep. Jim Matheson [D-UT]
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA]Rep. Thaddeus McCotter [R-MI]Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC]
Rep. Mike McIntyre [D-NC]Rep. Howard McKeon [R-CA]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]
Rep. John Mica [R-FL]Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME]Rep. Candice Miller [R-MI]Rep. Gary Miller [R-CA]
Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL]Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC]Rep. Tim Murphy [R-PA]Rep. Sue Myrick [R-NC]
Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX]Rep. Richard Nugent [R-FL]Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA]Rep. Alan Nunnelee [R-MS]
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX]Rep. William Owens [D-NY]Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS]Rep. Ron Paul [R-TX]
Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM]Rep. Mike Pence [R-IN]Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN]Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX]
Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS]Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL]Rep. Benjamin Quayle [R-AZ]Rep. Nick Rahall [D-WV]
Rep. Scott Rigell [R-VA]Rep. David Rivera [R-FL]Rep. David Roe [R-TN]Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL]
Rep. Mike J. Rogers [R-MI]Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN]Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL]Sen. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL]
Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL]Rep. Mike Ross [D-AR]Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA]Rep. Jon Runyan [R-NJ]
Rep. Paul Ryan [R-WI]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA]Rep. Jean Schmidt [R-OH]
Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA]
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC]Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI]Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX]Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL]
Rep. Heath Shuler [D-NC]Rep. Bill Shuster [R-PA]Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID]Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE]
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX]Rep. Steve Southerland [R-FL]Rep. Cliff Stearns [R-FL]
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Marlin Stutzman [R-IN]Rep. John Sullivan [R-OK]Rep. Lee Terry [R-NE]
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX]Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH]Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO]
Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI]Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR]Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN]
Rep. Allen West [R-FL]Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA]Rep. Ed Whitfield [R-KY]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR]Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA]Rep. Kevin Yoder [R-KS]
Rep. C.W. Young [R-FL]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]Sen. Todd Young [R-IN]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2011-01-25HouseReferred to House Ways and Means
2011-01-25HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2011-01-25HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Same As/Similar To

SB798 (Related) 2011-04-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback