US HB420 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the new Interstate Route 70 bridge over the Mississippi River that connects St. Louis, Missouri, to southwestern Illinois as the "Stan Musial Memorial Bridge."
Title
To designate the new Interstate Route 70 bridge over the Mississippi River connecting St. Louis, Missouri and southwestern Illinois as the "Stan Musial Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] |
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB166 (Same As) 2013-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB2383 (Related) 2013-07-12 - Became Public Law No: 113-18.
HB2383 (Related) 2013-07-12 - Became Public Law No: 113-18.
Subjects
Athletes
Congressional tributes
Illinois
Missouri
Professional sports
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Congressional tributes
Illinois
Missouri
Professional sports
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/420/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr420/BILLS-113hr420ih.pdf |