US HB4204 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands eligibility for internment in national cemeteries to include certain individuals who the Department of Veterans Affairs determines served honorably with a special guerilla unit or irregular forces in Laos in support of the U.S. Armed Forces between February 28, 1961, and May 7, 1975. Such individuals are eligible if, at the time of their death, they resided in the United States and were a U.S. citizen or alien lawfully admitted for permanent residence in the United States.
Title
Special Guerrilla Unit (SGU) Veterans Service Recognition Expansion Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] |
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2019-08-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-08-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Cemeteries and funerals
Conflicts and wars
Laos
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Vietnam
Asia
Cemeteries and funerals
Conflicts and wars
Laos
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Vietnam
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4204/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4204/BILLS-116hr4204ih.pdf |