US HB4225 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the relief of Maria Isabel Bueso Barrera, Alberto Bueso Mendoza, and Karla Maria Barrera De Bueso.
Title
For the relief of Maria Isabel Bueso Barrera, Alberto Bueso Mendoza, Karla Maria Barrera De Bueso, and Ana Lucia Bueso Barrera.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-12-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-08 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H7001-7002) |
2020-12-08 | House | H.Amdt.906 On agreeing to the Bass amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-08 | House | H.Amdt.906 Amendment (A001) offered by Ms. Bass. (consideration: CR H7001-7002; text: CR H7001-7002) |
2020-12-08 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7001-7002; text: CR H7001-7002) |
2020-12-08 | House | Ms. Bass asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2020-11-18 | House | Placed on the Private Calendar, Calendar No. 3. |
2020-11-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-596. |
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended). |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-08 | House | Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Discharged. |
2019-09-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-08-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-08-30 | House | Introduced in House |