US HB4243 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on September 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands initiatives to address maternal health in rural areas. The bill provides funding for the Health Resources and Services Administration (HRSA) to establish rural obstetric networks for improving outcomes in birth and maternal morbidity. Specifically, these networks must (1) connect individuals with care providers, (2) identify successful maternal-care models, (3) facilitate collaboration among rural providers, (4) provide training and guidance, (5) collaborate with academic institutions that have regional expertise, and (6) measure and address inequities in birth outcomes among rural residents.HRSA also must award five-year demonstration program grants to (1) train physicians, medical residents, and other practitioners to provide maternal and obstetric services in rural communities; and (2) support academic programs that develop or provide training to improve maternal care in rural areas.Further, the bill adds maternal-health services as part of the telehealth network and telehealth resource-centers grant programs.The bill also makes a series of changes to the research and reporting requirements of the Department of Health and Human Services and the Government Accountability Office with respect to data on maternal-health outcomes.
Title
Rural MOMS Act Rural Maternal and Obstetric Modernization of Services Act
Sponsors
Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-09-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-09-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2373 (Same As) 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4995 (Related) 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4995 (Related) 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Appropriations
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Medical education
Mental health
Minority health
Nursing
Performance measurement
Rural conditions and development
Sex and reproductive health
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Telephone and wireless communication
Women's health
Appropriations
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Medical education
Mental health
Minority health
Nursing
Performance measurement
Rural conditions and development
Sex and reproductive health
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Telephone and wireless communication
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4243/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4243/BILLS-116hr4243ih.pdf |