US HB4270 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-7)
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the President to prohibit the issuance of licenses to export certain defense items and services to the Hong Kong Police Force or the Hong Kong Auxiliary Police Force. Items subject to the prohibition include defense articles and services on the U.S. Munitions List and certain crime-control and detection technology and software. The prohibition shall not apply to a particular license if the President certifies to Congress that the covered exports are important to U.S. national interests and foreign policy goals. The prohibitions shall terminate when the President certifies to Congress that (1) the covered Hong Kong forces have not engaged in gross human rights violations for the one-year period leading up to the certification, (2) there has been an independent examination of human rights concerns related to the covered forces' crowd-control tactics, and (3) and the Hong Kong government has adequately addressed such concerns. The Department of State and the Department of Commerce shall report to Congress as to items subject to the prohibition that have been exported to the Hong Kong forces covered in the bill in the last five years.
Title
PROTECT Hong Kong Act Placing Restrictions on Teargas Exports and Crowd Control Technology to Hong Kong Act
Sponsors
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] |
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] |
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-10-15 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8124-8125) |
2019-10-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4270. |
2019-10-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8124-8127) |
2019-10-15 | House | Mr. Sherman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-09-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-09-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-09-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Asia
China
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Foreign aid and international relief
Hong Kong
Human rights
International affairs
Law enforcement administration and funding
Licensing and registrations
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Protest and dissent
Trade restrictions
China
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Foreign aid and international relief
Hong Kong
Human rights
International affairs
Law enforcement administration and funding
Licensing and registrations
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Protest and dissent
Trade restrictions