US HB4281 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on September 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs to authorize veterans to fill prescriptions for a year's supply of contraceptive pills, transdermal patches, and vaginal rings.
Title
ACE Veterans Act Access to Contraception Expansion for Veterans Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2019-09-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-09-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-09-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2821 (Related) 2019-11-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Family planning and birth control
Health care coverage and access
Veterans' medical care
Family planning and birth control
Health care coverage and access
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4281/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4281/BILLS-116hr4281ih.pdf |