US HB4283 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-12)
Status: Introduced on September 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Communications Commission, the National Telecommunications and Information Administration, and the Department of Agriculture to enter into an interagency agreement to coordinate the distribution of federal funds for new broadband deployment.
Title
Broadband Interagency Coordination Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN] | Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] |
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] |
Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK] | Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] |
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] |
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN] |
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2019-09-18 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7758) |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-09-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1294 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 311.
Subjects
Internet and video services
Public participation and lobbying
Public utilities and utility rates
Rural conditions and development
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees
Public participation and lobbying
Public utilities and utility rates
Rural conditions and development
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4283/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4283/BILLS-116hr4283ih.pdf |