US HB4290 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Homeowner Tax Fairness Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) extend through 2015 the exclusion from gross income of income attributable to the discharge of indebtedness on a principal residence, (2) extend through 2014 the tax deduction for mortgage insurance premiums, and (3) exclude from gross income any National Mortgage Settlement amount. Defines "National Mortgage Settlement amount" as any amount received pursuant to the settlement in a legal action against Bank of America Corporation filed in U.S. District Court on March 12, 2012, which is: (1) a payment for transitional assistance; (2) a payment from the Borrower Payment Fund under the National Mortgage Settlement to a borrower whose home was finally sold or taken in foreclosure after December 31, 2007, and before January 1, 2012; or (3) a payment received as a result of a foreclosure or excess charge of interest that the Department of Justice (DOJ) has determined was not in compliance with the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act.
Title
Homeowner Tax Fairness Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2012-03-28 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E477) |
Same As/Similar To
HB4202 (Related) 2012-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4250 (Related) 2012-03-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4336 (Related) 2012-03-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2250 (Related) 2012-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3224 (Related) 2012-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4250 (Related) 2012-03-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4336 (Related) 2012-03-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2250 (Related) 2012-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3224 (Related) 2012-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Housing finance and home ownership
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Taxation
Housing finance and home ownership
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/4290/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr4290/BILLS-112hr4290ih.pdf |