US HB4299 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 407.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 407.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the indefinite duration of certain military land withdrawals, to improve the management of lands currently subject to such withdrawals and to make the management of such lands more transparent, and for other purposes.
Title
To provide for the indefinite duration of certain military land withdrawals, to improve the management of lands currently subject to such withdrawals and to make the management of such lands more transparent, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 407. |
2018-02-02 | House | Committee on Armed Services discharged. |
2018-02-02 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-542, Part I. |
2017-12-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2017-11-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-11-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Armed forces and national security
California
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Historical and cultural resources
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Military education and training
Military facilities and property
Armed forces and national security
California
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Historical and cultural resources
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Military education and training
Military facilities and property