US HB4300 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires public housing agencies (PHAs) that administer housing choice voucher programs to, in coordination with the Department of Housing and Urban Development, extend tenant-based assistance for youth aging out of foster care under specified circumstances. Under current law, public housing assistance is available for up to 36 months for low-income youth who are 18 to 24 years old, left foster care at age 16 or older (or will soon leave foster care), and are homeless or at risk of becoming homeless. The bill requires PHAs to extend such housing assistance for up to 24 months (subject to available funds) for youth who are (1) employed; (2) enrolled in a workforce development program; (3) pursuing postsecondary education, a high school diploma, or the equivalent; or (4) participating in a family self-sufficiency program. Youth who are parents (or have a dependent under age six), are participating in an addiction recovery program, or cannot comply due to a medical condition may receive extended housing assistance without meeting these requirements. Further, youth receiving extended housing assistance are eligible for available supportive services. PHAs also must connect such youth with other community resources and coordinate with local child welfare agencies to receive referrals for the housing assistance program. The bill does not apply to housing choice vouchers that are already in use as of the date of the bill's enactment.
Title
Fostering Stable Housing Opportunities Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] |
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] |
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8937-8938) |
2019-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4300. |
2019-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8937-8939) |
2019-11-18 | House | Mr. Green, Al (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-09-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 47 - 0. |
2019-09-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-09-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2803 (Related) 2019-11-07 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 116-125.
Subjects
Adoption and foster care
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Higher education
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Low- and moderate-income housing
Public housing
User charges and fees
Youth employment and child labor
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Higher education
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Low- and moderate-income housing
Public housing
User charges and fees
Youth employment and child labor