US HB4302 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes public housing agencies to disclose to certain entities information regarding individuals and families who are homeless or at risk of homelessness. Such disclosure is limited to the confidential use of the information to facilitate, identify, assess, and link housing and supportive services to ensure continuity of care for such individuals and their families.
Title
Homeless Assistance Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2020-01-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-01-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H187) |
2020-01-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4302. |
2020-01-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H186-188) |
2020-01-13 | House | Mr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-09-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 49 - 0. |
2019-09-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-09-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Crime victims
Criminal justice information and records
Domestic violence and child abuse
Family services
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development
Low- and moderate-income housing
Public housing
Right of privacy
Criminal justice information and records
Domestic violence and child abuse
Family services
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development
Low- and moderate-income housing
Public housing
Right of privacy